NE LR209 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-29 - Notice of hearing for October 06, 2021
Pending: Legislature Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-29 - Notice of hearing for October 06, 2021
Pending: Legislature Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Interim study to examine the appropriations necessary for creating public health crisis zones
Title
Interim study to examine the appropriations necessary for creating public health crisis zones
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-29 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for October 06, 2021 |
2021-05-20 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2021-05-19 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2021-05-19 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=46470 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/Intro/LR209.pdf |