NE LR201 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Create the School Finance Modernization Committee as a special legislative committee
Title
Create the School Finance Modernization Committee as a special legislative committee
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2016-01-06 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover resolution |
2015-04-23 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for May 01, 2015 |
2015-04-22 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2015-04-21 | Legislature | Speaker's announcement |
2015-04-21 | Legislature | Laid over |
2015-04-21 | Legislature | Date of introduction |