NE LR193 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-03 - Notice of hearing for December 18, 2019
Pending: Legislature Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-03 - Notice of hearing for December 18, 2019
Pending: Legislature Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Interim study to assess implementation of the federal Family First Prevention Services Act in Nebraska and identify opportunities for children and families
Title
Interim study to assess implementation of the federal Family First Prevention Services Act in Nebraska and identify opportunities for children and families
Sponsors
Sen. Kate Bolz [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-03 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for December 18, 2019 |
2019-05-24 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=40354 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LR193.pdf |