NE LR192 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-12 - Notice of hearing for December 12, 2019
Pending: Legislature Business and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-12 - Notice of hearing for December 12, 2019
Pending: Legislature Business and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Interim study to examine workforce development initiatives with emphasis on hearing the perspectives of employees across industries
Title
Interim study to examine workforce development initiatives with emphasis on hearing the perspectives of employees across industries
Sponsors
Sen. Kate Bolz [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-12 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for December 12, 2019 |
2019-05-24 | Legislature | Referred to Business and Labor Committee |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=40218 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LR192.pdf |