NE LR191 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-07 - Notice of hearing for October 29, 2021
Pending: Legislature Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-07 - Notice of hearing for October 29, 2021
Pending: Legislature Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Interim study to examine the effect of universal recognition of occupational licenses on populations frequently negatively impacted by occupational licensing in the state
Title
Interim study to examine the effect of universal recognition of occupational licenses on populations frequently negatively impacted by occupational licensing in the state
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-07 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for October 29, 2021 |
2021-05-20 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2021-05-18 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2021-05-18 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=46194 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/Intro/LR191.pdf |