NE LR191 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-25 - Notice of hearing for September 15, 2017
Pending: Legislature Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-25 - Notice of hearing for September 15, 2017
Pending: Legislature Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Interim study to examine possible legislative reforms to Nebraska's mandatory minimum sentencing laws
Title
Interim study to examine possible legislative reforms to Nebraska's mandatory minimum sentencing laws
Sponsors
Sen. Laura Ebke [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for September 15, 2017 |
2017-05-15 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2017-05-10 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2017-05-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=33586 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LR191.pdf |