NE LR175 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-28 - Notice of hearing for December 04, 2019 (cancel)
Pending: Legislature Transportation and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-28 - Notice of hearing for December 04, 2019 (cancel)
Pending: Legislature Transportation and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Interim study to ensure accelerated broadband deployment statewide
Title
Interim study to ensure accelerated broadband deployment statewide
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-28 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for December 04, 2019 (cancel) |
2019-09-05 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for December 04, 2019 |
2019-05-24 | Legislature | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=40443 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LR175.pdf |