NE LR166 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-05 - Notice of hearing for December 04, 2019
Pending: Legislature Transportation and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-05 - Notice of hearing for December 04, 2019
Pending: Legislature Transportation and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Interim study to review the report of the Rural Broadband Task Force that was created by Laws 2018, LB994
Title
Interim study to review the report of the Rural Broadband Task Force that was created by Laws 2018, LB994
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-05 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for December 04, 2019 |
2019-05-24 | Legislature | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=40303 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LR166.pdf |