NE LR164 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-18 - Notice of hearing for September 08, 2017
Pending: Legislature Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-18 - Notice of hearing for September 08, 2017
Pending: Legislature Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Interim study to examine the need for restoration, development, and capital improvement of sites that attract tourists to and within Nebraska
Title
Interim study to examine the need for restoration, development, and capital improvement of sites that attract tourists to and within Nebraska
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Quick [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-18 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for September 08, 2017 |
2017-05-15 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2017-05-09 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2017-05-09 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=33594 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LR164.pdf |