NE LR158 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-08-04 - Notice of hearing for August 11, 2021
Pending: Legislature Business and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-08-04 - Notice of hearing for August 11, 2021
Pending: Legislature Business and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Interim study to examine the accuracy of payments by the Department of Labor to recipients of state and federal benefit programs
Title
Interim study to examine the accuracy of payments by the Department of Labor to recipients of state and federal benefit programs
Sponsors
Sen. Carol Blood [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-04 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for August 11, 2021 |
2021-05-20 | Legislature | Referred to Business and Labor Committee |
2021-05-18 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2021-05-18 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=46401 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/Intro/LR158.pdf |