NE LR157 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Introduced on May 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-11-07 - Notice of hearing for December 07, 2023
Pending: Legislature Nebraska Retirement Systems Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-11-07 - Notice of hearing for December 07, 2023
Pending: Legislature Nebraska Retirement Systems Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Interim study to examine the retirement systems administered by the Public Employees Retirement Board
Title
Interim study to examine the retirement systems administered by the Public Employees Retirement Board
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-11-07 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for December 07, 2023 |
2023-05-23 | Legislature | Referred to Nebraska Retirement Systems Committee |
2023-05-11 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2023-05-11 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=53849 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/Intro/LR157.pdf |