NE LR151 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-18 - President/Speaker signed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Recognize the historic significance of the In re Gault decision by the U.S. Supreme Court, and acknowledge its importance to the juvenile justice system

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognize the historic significance of the In re Gault decision by the U.S. Supreme Court, and acknowledge its importance to the juvenile justice system

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-18LegislaturePresident/Speaker signed
2017-05-18LegislatureAdopted
2017-05-17LegislatureHansen name added
2017-05-17LegislatureReported to the Legislature for further consideration
2017-05-10LegislatureNotice of hearing for May 17, 2017
2017-05-09LegislatureReferred to Judiciary Committee
2017-05-09LegislatureSpeaker's announcement
2017-05-09LegislatureLaid over
2017-05-09LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback