NE LR145 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-29 - Notice of hearing for October 06, 2021
Pending: Legislature Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-29 - Notice of hearing for October 06, 2021
Pending: Legislature Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Interim study of the adequacy of current aged and disabled medicaid waiver assisted-living provider rates
Title
Interim study of the adequacy of current aged and disabled medicaid waiver assisted-living provider rates
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-29 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for October 06, 2021 |
2021-05-20 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2021-05-12 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2021-05-12 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=46164 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/Intro/LR145.pdf |