NE LR14 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-28 - Presented to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-28 - Presented to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution to Congress for convention of the states to propose amendments to the United States Constitution
Title
Resolution to Congress for convention of the states to propose amendments to the United States Constitution
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-28 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading (Y: 32 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - Legislature - McCollister FA67 lost (Y: 8 N: 36 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-01-28 - Legislature - Halloran MO135 prevailed (Y: 33 N: 10 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Legislature - DeBoer FA63 adopted (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 32 N: 10 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Legislature - Morfeld AM1545 lost (Y: 12 N: 22 NV: 11 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-05-26 - Legislature - Flood MO46 prevailed (Y: 30 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Legislature - Halloran MO17 failed (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 8 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - Legislature - McCollister FA67 lost (Y: 8 N: 36 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-01-28 - Legislature - Halloran MO135 prevailed (Y: 33 N: 10 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Legislature - DeBoer FA63 adopted (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 32 N: 10 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Legislature - Morfeld AM1545 lost (Y: 12 N: 22 NV: 11 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-05-26 - Legislature - Flood MO46 prevailed (Y: 30 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Legislature - Halloran MO17 failed (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 8 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-28 | Legislature | Presented to Secretary of State |
2022-01-28 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2022-01-28 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 32-11-6 |
2022-01-28 | Legislature | McCollister FA67 not considered |
2022-01-28 | Legislature | Motion to return to Select File failed |
2022-01-28 | Legislature | Halloran MO135 prevailed |
2022-01-28 | Legislature | Halloran MO135 Invoke cloture pursuant to Rule 7, Sec. 10 filed |
2022-01-28 | Legislature | McCollister FA67 filed |
2022-01-24 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2022-01-20 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2022-01-20 | Legislature | DeBoer FA63 adopted |
2022-01-20 | Legislature | DeBoer FA63 filed |
2022-01-20 | Legislature | Morfeld AM1615 withdrawn |
2022-01-20 | Legislature | Hansen, M. AM1538 withdrawn |
2022-01-20 | Legislature | McCollister AM1555 withdrawn |
2022-01-19 | Legislature | Morfeld AM1615 filed |
2022-01-13 | Legislature | Correction |
2022-01-18 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2022-01-10 | Legislature | Hansen, M. AM1538 refiled |
2022-01-10 | Legislature | McCollister AM1555 filed |
2022-01-10 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2022-01-10 | Legislature | Hunt AM1550 withdrawn |
2022-01-10 | Legislature | Hunt AM1550 filed |
2022-01-10 | Legislature | Hansen, M. AM1538 withdrawn |
2022-01-10 | Legislature | Hansen, M. AM1538 filed |
2022-01-10 | Legislature | Morfeld AM1545 lost |
2022-01-10 | Legislature | Morfeld AM1545 pending |
2022-01-10 | Legislature | Morfeld AM1545 filed |
2022-01-06 | Legislature | Flood name added |
2022-01-05 | Legislature | Halloran priority resolution |
2022-01-05 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover resolution |
2021-05-27 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2021-05-26 | Legislature | Rules suspension to provide LR14 not stand indefinitely postponed |
2021-05-26 | Legislature | Flood MO46 prevailed |
2021-04-26 | Legislature | Flood MO46 Suspend Rule 3, Section 20 (d) so as to provide that LR14 "not stand as indefinitely postponed" filed |
2021-04-23 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2021-04-23 | Legislature | Halloran MO17 failed |
2021-03-31 | Legislature | Halloran MO17 Place on General File filed |
2021-03-16 | Legislature | Hilkemann name added |
2021-03-10 | Legislature | Halloran priority resolution |
2021-02-01 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 10, 2021 |
2021-01-12 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2021-01-08 | Legislature | Date of introduction |