NE LR130 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 5 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-08-10 - Notice of hearing for September 14, 2017
Pending: Legislature Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Interim study to examine issues related to the use of substitute teachers

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Interim study to examine issues related to the use of substitute teachers

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-10LegislatureNotice of hearing for September 14, 2017
2017-08-03LegislatureNotice of hearing for September 08, 2017 (cancel)
2017-07-26LegislatureNotice of hearing for September 08, 2017
2017-05-15LegislatureReferred to Education Committee
2017-05-05LegislatureReferred to Executive Board
2017-05-05LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback