NE LR127 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - President/Speaker signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provide the Executive Board appoint a special committee of the Legislature to be known as the Nebraska Justice System Special Oversight Committee

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide the Executive Board appoint a special committee of the Legislature to be known as the Nebraska Justice System Special Oversight Committee

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-23LegislaturePresident/Speaker signed
2017-05-23LegislatureReport
2017-05-23LegislatureEnrolled resolution
2017-05-23LegislatureCorrectly enrolled
2017-05-18LegislatureAdopted
2017-05-18LegislatureLarson requested a majority of elected members be required for adoption
2017-05-18LegislatureExecutive Board AM1417 adopted
2017-05-17LegislatureExecutive Board AM1417 filed
2017-05-17LegislatureReported to the Legislature for further consideration with AM1417
2017-05-04LegislatureNotice of hearing for May 16, 2017
2017-05-04LegislatureReferred to Executive Board
2017-05-04LegislatureSpeaker's announcement
2017-05-04LegislatureLaid over
2017-05-04LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback