NE LR127 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - President/Speaker signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - President/Speaker signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provide the Executive Board appoint a special committee of the Legislature to be known as the Nebraska Justice System Special Oversight Committee
Title
Provide the Executive Board appoint a special committee of the Legislature to be known as the Nebraska Justice System Special Oversight Committee
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Krist [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2017-05-23 | Legislature | Report |
2017-05-23 | Legislature | Enrolled resolution |
2017-05-23 | Legislature | Correctly enrolled |
2017-05-18 | Legislature | Adopted |
2017-05-18 | Legislature | Larson requested a majority of elected members be required for adoption |
2017-05-18 | Legislature | Executive Board AM1417 adopted |
2017-05-17 | Legislature | Executive Board AM1417 filed |
2017-05-17 | Legislature | Reported to the Legislature for further consideration with AM1417 |
2017-05-04 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for May 16, 2017 |
2017-05-04 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2017-05-04 | Legislature | Speaker's announcement |
2017-05-04 | Legislature | Laid over |
2017-05-04 | Legislature | Date of introduction |