NE LR124 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-08 - Notice of hearing for August 13, 2021
Pending: Legislature Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-08 - Notice of hearing for August 13, 2021
Pending: Legislature Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Interim study to examine issues relating to the designation of extremely blighted areas under the Community Development Law
Title
Interim study to examine issues relating to the designation of extremely blighted areas under the Community Development Law
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-08 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for August 13, 2021 |
2021-05-20 | Legislature | Referred to Urban Affairs Committee |
2021-05-06 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2021-05-06 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=46094 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/Intro/LR124.pdf |