NE LR114 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-09 - Notice of hearing for September 19, 2019
Pending: Legislature Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-09 - Notice of hearing for September 19, 2019
Pending: Legislature Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Interim study to examine conditions under which the board of directors of the Nebraska Cooperative Republican Platte Enhancement Project and the Rock Creek augmentation project may dispose of real property each owns related to the projects
Title
Interim study to examine conditions under which the board of directors of the Nebraska Cooperative Republican Platte Enhancement Project and the Rock Creek augmentation project may dispose of real property each owns related to the projects
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Hughes [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-09 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for September 19, 2019 |
2019-05-24 | Legislature | Referred to Natural Resources Committee |
2019-05-07 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2019-05-07 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=39940 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LR114.pdf |