NE LR113 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-12 - Notice of hearing for December 12, 2019
Pending: Legislature Business and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-12 - Notice of hearing for December 12, 2019
Pending: Legislature Business and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Interim study to examine existing anti-discrimination employment related laws to ensure they are advancing the public policy of Nebraska
Title
Interim study to examine existing anti-discrimination employment related laws to ensure they are advancing the public policy of Nebraska
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-12 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for December 12, 2019 |
2019-05-24 | Legislature | Referred to Business and Labor Committee |
2019-05-07 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2019-05-07 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=39943 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LR113.pdf |