NE LR113 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-08-03 - Notice of hearing for September 08, 2017 (cancel)
Pending: Legislature Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-08-03 - Notice of hearing for September 08, 2017 (cancel)
Pending: Legislature Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Interim study to examine the long-term fiscal sustainability of the Nebraska Health Care Cash Fund to pay for health care and related services
Title
Interim study to examine the long-term fiscal sustainability of the Nebraska Health Care Cash Fund to pay for health care and related services
Sponsors
Sen. Kate Bolz [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-03 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for September 08, 2017 (cancel) |
2017-07-18 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for September 08, 2017 |
2017-05-15 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2017-04-24 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2017-04-24 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=32998 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LR113.pdf |