NE LR106 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-12 - Notice of hearing for December 12, 2019
Pending: Legislature Business and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-12 - Notice of hearing for December 12, 2019
Pending: Legislature Business and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Interim study to review the Boiler Safety Code Advisory Board and occupational regulations for boiler inspectors
Title
Interim study to review the Boiler Safety Code Advisory Board and occupational regulations for boiler inspectors
Sponsors
Sen. Matt Hansen [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-12 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for December 12, 2019 |
2019-05-24 | Legislature | Referred to Business and Labor Committee |
2019-05-01 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2019-05-01 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=39814 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LR106.pdf |