NE LR105 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on May 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-22 - Notice of hearing for September 13, 2019
Pending: Legislature Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-22 - Notice of hearing for September 13, 2019
Pending: Legislature Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Interim study to investigate the eligibility requirements applied to children with disabilities for coverage under the Medical Assistance Act
Title
Interim study to investigate the eligibility requirements applied to children with disabilities for coverage under the Medical Assistance Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-22 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for September 13, 2019 |
2019-05-24 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-05-01 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2019-05-01 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=39793 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LR105.pdf |