NE LR1 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-01 - President/Speaker signed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-01 - President/Speaker signed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Express support for the United States Air Force to reestablish the United States Space Command headquarters at Offutt Air Force Base
Title
Express support for the United States Air Force to reestablish the United States Space Command headquarters at Offutt Air Force Base
Sponsors
Sen. Carol Blood [N] |
Roll Calls
2021-01-29 - Legislature - Adopted (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-01 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2021-01-29 | Legislature | Adopted |
2021-01-28 | Legislature | Reported to the Legislature for further consideration |
2021-01-25 | Legislature | Briese name added |
2021-01-19 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 27, 2021 |
2021-01-11 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2021-01-07 | Legislature | Speaker's announcement |
2021-01-07 | Legislature | Laid over |
2021-01-07 | Legislature | Date of introduction |