NE LB999 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Require cities and villages to pay for appointed counsel for prosecutions and adjudications for violation of city and village ordinances
Title
Require cities and villages to pay for appointed counsel for prosecutions and adjudications for violation of city and village ordinances
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-01-27 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 04, 2020 |
2020-01-15 | Legislature | Referred to Urban Affairs Committee |
2020-01-14 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=41430 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB999.pdf |