NE LB99 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-27 - Provisions/portions of LB99 amended into LB131 by AM751
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-27 - Provisions/portions of LB99 amended into LB131 by AM751
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions of the Community Development Law relating to limitations on blighted areas
Title
Change provisions of the Community Development Law relating to limitations on blighted areas
Sponsors
Sen. Lynne Walz [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-27 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB99 amended into LB131 by AM751 |
2021-05-27 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2021-05-27 | Legislature | Motion to suspend rules to indefinitely postpone prevailed |
2021-05-26 | Legislature | Motion to suspend rules to indefinitely postpone filed |
2021-02-18 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2021-01-27 | Legislature | Wayne name added |
2021-01-19 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 26, 2021 |
2021-01-11 | Legislature | Referred to Urban Affairs Committee |
2021-01-07 | Legislature | Date of introduction |