NE LB986 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Adopt the Neighborhood Improvement District Act and change provisions relating to special assessments for other improvement or development districts as prescribed

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adopt the Neighborhood Improvement District Act and change provisions relating to special assessments for other improvement or development districts as prescribed

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18LegislatureIndefinitely postponed
2018-03-21LegislatureHansen AM2072 filed
2018-03-21LegislatureLarson MO281 prevailed
2018-03-21LegislatureLarson MO281 Bracket until April 18, 2018 filed
2018-03-21LegislatureLarson MO280 not approved
2018-03-21LegislatureLarson MO280 Unanimous consent to bracket until April 18, 2018 filed
2018-03-21LegislatureUrban Affairs AM1958 pending
2018-02-26LegislatureUrban Affairs AM1958 filed
2018-02-26LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM1958
2018-02-20LegislatureHansen priority bill
2018-01-30LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 06, 2018
2018-01-17LegislatureReferred to Urban Affairs Committee
2018-01-11LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback