NE LB981 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for applicability of provisions regarding state contracts for services to certain state entities
Title
Provide for applicability of provisions regarding state contracts for services to certain state entities
Sponsors
Sen. Megan Hunt [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-02-11 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 21, 2020 |
2020-01-15 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2020-01-14 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=41309 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB981.pdf |