NE LB980 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for release for medical treatment, change provisions relating to medical parole, and provide for parole eligibility for persons serving sentences of life imprisonment
Title
Provide for release for medical treatment, change provisions relating to medical parole, and provide for parole eligibility for persons serving sentences of life imprisonment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-01-24 | Legislature | McCollister name added |
2022-01-18 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 26, 2022 |
2022-01-13 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2022-01-12 | Legislature | Date of introduction |