NE LB98 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extend certain levy authority for natural resources districts
Title
Extend certain levy authority for natural resources districts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-03-07 | Legislature | Friesen MO249 failed |
2018-03-07 | Legislature | Friesen MO249 Invoke cloture filed |
2018-03-07 | Legislature | Erdman MO248 pending |
2018-03-07 | Legislature | Erdman MO248 Bracket until April 18, 2018 filed |
2018-03-07 | Legislature | Erdman AM819 pending |
2018-02-12 | Legislature | Stinner priority bill |
2018-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2017-05-02 | Legislature | Friesen MO113 failed |
2017-05-02 | Legislature | Friesen MO113 Invoke cloture filed |
2017-05-02 | Legislature | Erdman AM819 pending |
2017-03-30 | Legislature | Kuehn AM823 filed |
2017-03-30 | Legislature | Erdman AM819 pending |
2017-03-30 | Legislature | Erdman AM819 filed |
2017-03-30 | Legislature | Groene MO67 failed |
2017-03-30 | Legislature | Groene MO67 Bracket until June 2, 2017 filed |
2017-03-30 | Legislature | Groene AM486 lost |
2017-03-29 | Legislature | Groene AM486 filed |
2017-03-15 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2017-03-13 | Legislature | Speaker priority bill |
2017-01-25 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 02, 2017 |
2017-01-09 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2017-01-05 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=31228 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB98.pdf |