NE LB97 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-29 - Provisions/portions of LB97 amended into LB642 by AM931
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-29 - Provisions/portions of LB97 amended into LB642 by AM931
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminate additional fees for Pearl Harbor and disabled veteran license plates
Title
Eliminate additional fees for Pearl Harbor and disabled veteran license plates
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Smith [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-29 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB97 amended into LB642 by AM931 |
2015-05-29 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2015-05-29 | Legislature | Motion to suspend rules to indefinitely postpone prevailed |
2015-05-28 | Legislature | Motion to suspend rules to indefinitely postpone filed |
2015-02-23 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2015-01-15 | Legislature | Garrett name added |
2015-01-13 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 20, 2015 |
2015-01-12 | Legislature | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee |
2015-01-08 | Legislature | Date of introduction |