NE LB963 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 6 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-23 - Placed on Final Reading with ST47
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Change workers' compensation provisions for injuries to first responders and frontline state employees and burial expenses

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change workers' compensation provisions for injuries to first responders and frontline state employees and burial expenses

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-06 - Legislature - McDonnell AM2734 adopted (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Legislature - McDonnell AM2776 adopted (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 19 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Legislature - Business and Labor AM2523 adopted (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-23LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading with ST47
2020-03-06LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2020-03-06LegislatureMcDonnell AM2734 adopted
2020-03-06LegislatureMcDonnell AM2776 adopted
2020-03-06LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER179 adopted
2020-03-05LegislatureMcDonnell AM2734 filed
2020-03-05LegislatureMcDonnell AM2776 filed
2020-03-03LegislatureHansen, M. name added
2020-03-03LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER179 filed
2020-03-03LegislaturePlaced on Select File with ER179
2020-02-26LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2020-02-26LegislatureBusiness and Labor AM2523 adopted
2020-02-21LegislatureMcDonnell priority bill
2020-02-20LegislatureBusiness and Labor AM2523 filed
2020-02-20LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM2523
2020-02-10LegislatureBlood name added
2020-01-15LegislatureNotice of hearing for January 27, 2020
2020-01-14LegislatureReferred to Business and Labor Committee
2020-01-13LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback