NE LB955 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-05 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provide for reciprocal certification of military police officers and law enforcement officers from other jurisdictions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide for reciprocal certification of military police officers and law enforcement officers from other jurisdictions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-05LegislatureIndefinitely postponed
2018-01-16LegislatureNotice of hearing for January 31, 2018
2018-01-11LegislatureReferred to Judiciary Committee
2018-01-10LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback