NE LB951 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change elements of claims under the Nebraska Claims for Wrongful Conviction and Imprisonment Act
Title
Change elements of claims under the Nebraska Claims for Wrongful Conviction and Imprisonment Act
Sponsors
Sen. Kate Bolz [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-01-15 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 24, 2020 |
2020-01-14 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2020-01-13 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=40996 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB951.pdf |