NE LB948 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Require insurers to reveal certain liability coverage limits to injured parties

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Require insurers to reveal certain liability coverage limits to injured parties

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-04-20LegislatureIndefinitely postponed
2022-01-26LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 22, 2022
2022-01-11LegislatureReferred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee
2022-01-10LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback