NE LB948 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change and eliminate provisions relating to rules and regulations
Title
Change and eliminate provisions relating to rules and regulations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-04-10 | Legislature | Harr MO346 pending |
2018-04-10 | Legislature | Harr MO346 Bracket until April 11, 2018 filed |
2018-04-10 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER184 adopted |
2018-04-10 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER184 filed |
2018-04-10 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER184 |
2018-04-09 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2018-04-09 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM1931 adopted |
2018-04-09 | Legislature | Murante MO344 prevailed |
2018-04-09 | Legislature | Murante MO344 Invoke cloture filed |
2018-04-09 | Legislature | Chambers MO343 failed |
2018-04-09 | Legislature | Chambers MO343 Recommit to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee filed |
2018-04-09 | Legislature | Harr AM2473 lost |
2018-03-21 | Legislature | Morfeld AM2561 filed |
2018-03-20 | Legislature | Harr AM2476 filed |
2018-03-20 | Legislature | Harr AM2478 filed |
2018-03-20 | Legislature | Harr AM2497 filed |
2018-03-20 | Legislature | Harr AM2494 filed |
2018-03-20 | Legislature | Harr AM2507 filed |
2018-03-20 | Legislature | Chambers MO278 withdrawn |
2018-03-20 | Legislature | Chambers MO278 Bracket until April 18, 2018 filed |
2018-03-20 | Legislature | Harr AM2473 pending |
2018-03-20 | Legislature | Harr AM2473 filed |
2018-03-20 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM1931 pending |
2018-02-23 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM1931 filed |
2018-02-23 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM1931 |
2018-02-14 | Legislature | Thibodeau priority bill |
2018-02-08 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 15, 2018 |
2018-01-11 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2018-01-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=34135 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB948.pdf |