NE LB945 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB945 amended into LB1218 by AM2213
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB945 amended into LB1218 by AM2213
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the Teach in Nebraska Today Act, provide for student loan repayment assistance, and appropriate General Funds
Title
Adopt the Teach in Nebraska Today Act, provide for student loan repayment assistance, and appropriate General Funds
Sponsors
Sen. Lou Linehan [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB945 amended into LB1218 by AM2213 |
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-01-24 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 01, 2022 |
2022-01-19 | Legislature | DeBoer name added |
2022-01-11 | Legislature | Referred to Education Committee |
2022-01-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |