NE LB944 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Enrollment and Review ER168 filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Change provisions relating to motor vehicles

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change provisions relating to motor vehicles

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-11 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Legislature - Transportation and Telecommunications AM2307 adopted (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER168 filed
2020-02-13LegislaturePlaced on Select File with ER168
2020-02-11LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2020-02-11LegislatureTransportation and Telecommunications AM2307 adopted
2020-02-10LegislatureTransportation and Telecommunications AM2307 filed
2020-02-10LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM2307
2020-02-05LegislatureTransportation and Telecommunications priority bill
2020-01-15LegislatureNotice of hearing for January 27, 2020
2020-01-14LegislatureReferred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee
2020-01-13LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback