NE LB943 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibit certain provisions in a health plan in relation to clinician-administered drugs
Title
Prohibit certain provisions in a health plan in relation to clinician-administered drugs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-03-09 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2022-01-26 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 15, 2022 |
2022-01-11 | Legislature | Referred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee |
2022-01-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |