NE LB94 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-06 - Approved by Governor on March 05, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-06 - Approved by Governor on March 05, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for issuance of printed motor vehicle certificate of title for nonresidents as prescribed
Title
Provide for issuance of printed motor vehicle certificate of title for nonresidents as prescribed
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Smith [N] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-27 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-06 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on March 05, 2015 |
2015-02-27 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on February 27, 2015 |
2015-02-27 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2015-02-27 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3 |
2015-02-27 | Legislature | Chambers FA21 withdrawn |
2015-02-27 | Legislature | Chambers FA21 filed |
2015-02-27 | Legislature | Motion to return to Select File withdrawn |
2015-02-20 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2015-02-19 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2015-02-09 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2015-02-05 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2015-01-29 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2015-01-20 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 27, 2015 |
2015-01-12 | Legislature | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee |
2015-01-08 | Legislature | Date of introduction |