NE LB934 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Make certain license plate and registration decal provisions secondary violations and change penalties
Title
Make certain license plate and registration decal provisions secondary violations and change penalties
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-01-13 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 24, 2022 |
2022-01-11 | Legislature | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee |
2022-01-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |