NE LB931 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB934 amended into LB931 by AM1849
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB934 amended into LB931 by AM1849
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provide requirements for opiate and controlled substance prescriptions
Title
Provide requirements for opiate and controlled substance prescriptions
Sponsors
Sen. Sara Howard [N] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB934 amended into LB931 by AM1849 |
2018-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB933 amended into LB931 by AM1849 |
2018-04-04 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 04, 2018 |
2018-03-29 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on March 29, 2018 |
2018-03-29 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2018-03-29 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1 |
2018-03-20 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2018-03-15 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2018-03-15 | Legislature | Howard AM2228 adopted |
2018-03-15 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER112 adopted |
2018-03-09 | Legislature | Howard AM2228 filed |
2018-02-28 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER112 filed |
2018-02-28 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER112 |
2018-02-28 | Legislature | Halloran name added |
2018-02-26 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2018-02-26 | Legislature | Larson AM2115 withdrawn |
2018-02-26 | Legislature | Larson AM2115 filed |
2018-02-26 | Legislature | Chambers MO231 withdrawn |
2018-02-26 | Legislature | Chambers MO231 Bracket until April 18, 2018 filed |
2018-02-26 | Legislature | Judiciary AM1849 adopted |
2018-02-13 | Legislature | Howard priority bill |
2018-02-12 | Legislature | Judiciary AM1849 filed |
2018-02-12 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM1849 |
2018-01-16 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 26, 2018 |
2018-01-10 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2018-01-09 | Legislature | Date of introduction |