NE LB926 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempt members of the armed forces on active duty and their spouses from motor vehicle taxes
Title
Exempt members of the armed forces on active duty and their spouses from motor vehicle taxes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-02-15 | Legislature | Brewer name added |
2018-02-07 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 15, 2018 |
2018-01-10 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2018-01-09 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=34499 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB926.pdf |