NE LB924 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-11 - Approved by Governor on August 06, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-11 - Approved by Governor on August 06, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to racial profiling and require law enforcement training
Title
Change provisions relating to racial profiling and require law enforcement training
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-31 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 49-0-0 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Legislature - Chambers AM3000 adopted (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Legislature - Returned to Select File for specific amendment (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Legislature - Chambers AM3000 adopted (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Legislature - Returned to Select File for specific amendment (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-11 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on August 06, 2020 |
2020-08-03 | Legislature | Vargas name added |
2020-08-03 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on July 31, 2020 |
2020-07-31 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2020-07-31 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 49-0-0 |
2020-07-23 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading Second |
2020-07-21 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Reengrossment |
2020-07-21 | Legislature | Chambers AM3000 adopted |
2020-07-21 | Legislature | Returned to Select File for specific amendment |
2020-07-20 | Legislature | Chambers AM3000 filed |
2020-02-25 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2020-02-21 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2020-02-18 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2020-02-12 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2020-02-06 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2020-02-06 | Legislature | Chambers priority bill |
2020-01-23 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 31, 2020 |
2020-01-15 | Legislature | Wayne name added |
2020-01-13 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2020-01-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |