NE LB923 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-18 - Approved by Governor on August 15, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-18 - Approved by Governor on August 15, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change sales tax provisions relating to gross receipts
Title
Change sales tax provisions relating to gross receipts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-11 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 48-0-1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-28 - Legislature - Wayne AM3210 lost (Y: 2 N: 38 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-07-22 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Legislature - Lindstrom AM3150 adopted (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-28 - Legislature - Wayne AM3210 lost (Y: 2 N: 38 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-07-22 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Legislature - Lindstrom AM3150 adopted (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-18 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on August 15, 2020 |
2020-08-12 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on August 11, 2020 |
2020-08-11 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2020-08-11 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 48-0-1 |
2020-07-29 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2020-07-28 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2020-07-28 | Legislature | Wayne AM3210 lost |
2020-07-28 | Legislature | Wayne AM3210 filed |
2020-07-27 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2020-07-22 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2020-07-22 | Legislature | Lindstrom AM3150 adopted |
2020-07-22 | Legislature | Lindstrom AM3150 filed |
2020-02-25 | Legislature | Speaker priority bill |
2020-02-04 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2020-01-23 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 30, 2020 |
2020-01-13 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2020-01-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |