NE LB92 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Provisions/portions of LB282 amended into LB92 by AM609
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Require health carriers to provide coverage for telehealth services and change telehealth provisions relating to children's behavioral health

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Require health carriers to provide coverage for telehealth services and change telehealth provisions relating to children's behavioral health

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-24 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 49-0-0 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 49-0-0 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-23LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB282 amended into LB92 by AM609
2017-05-02LegislatureApproved by Governor on April 27, 2017
2017-04-24LegislaturePresented to Governor on April 24, 2017
2017-04-24LegislaturePresident/Speaker signed
2017-04-24LegislaturePassed on Final Reading 49-0-0
2017-04-10LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading with ST5
2017-04-03LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2017-04-03LegislatureRiepe AM609 adopted
2017-03-13LegislatureRiepe AM609 filed
2017-03-08LegislatureBriese name added
2017-03-07LegislaturePlaced on Select File
2017-03-06LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2017-03-06LegislatureBanking, Commerce and Insurance AM253 adopted
2017-02-23LegislatureKolterman priority bill
2017-02-16LegislatureBanking, Commerce and Insurance AM253 filed
2017-02-16LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM253
2017-01-31LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 13, 2017
2017-01-09LegislatureReferred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee
2017-01-05LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback