NE LB915 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB915 amended into LB1024 by AM2341
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB915 amended into LB1024 by AM2341
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide a requirement for grant eligibility under the Middle Income Workforce Housing Investment Act
Title
Provide a requirement for grant eligibility under the Middle Income Workforce Housing Investment Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB915 amended into LB1024 by AM2341 |
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-02-16 | Legislature | Urban Affairs AM1860 filed |
2022-02-16 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM1860 |
2022-01-25 | Legislature | Wayne AM1666 filed |
2022-01-24 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 01, 2022 |
2022-01-11 | Legislature | Referred to Urban Affairs Committee |
2022-01-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |