NE LB914 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change rental deposit, damage, and notice of termination provisions under the Mobile Home Landlord and Tenant Act
Title
Change rental deposit, damage, and notice of termination provisions under the Mobile Home Landlord and Tenant Act
Sponsors
Sen. Megan Hunt [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-01-15 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 24, 2020 |
2020-01-13 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2020-01-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=41077 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB914.pdf |