NE LB913 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-20 - Health and Human Services AM2321 filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Require a state plan amendment for postpartum coverage under the Children’s Health Insurance Program

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Require a state plan amendment for postpartum coverage under the Children’s Health Insurance Program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-20LegislatureHealth and Human Services AM2321 filed
2024-02-20LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM2321
2024-02-05LegislatureVargas name added
2024-01-31LegislatureConrad name added
2024-01-23LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 02, 2024
2024-01-08LegislatureReferred to Health and Human Services Committee
2024-01-04LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback