NE LB912 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for posting by public schools of a toll-free telephone number set up to report child abuse and neglect
Title
Provide for posting by public schools of a toll-free telephone number set up to report child abuse and neglect
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-02-21 | Legislature | Education AM1597 filed |
2018-02-21 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM1597 |
2018-01-16 | Legislature | Howard name added |
2018-01-16 | Legislature | Walz name added |
2018-01-16 | Legislature | Baker name added |
2018-01-10 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 23, 2018 |
2018-01-09 | Legislature | Referred to Education Committee |
2018-01-08 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=34536 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB912.pdf |